FRIENDSHIP AT HOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friendship at Home (FAH) CIO started in September 2006, The aim of our organisation is to help combat isolation and loneliness across NEL and to improve older people?s quality of life. We offer a range of support including: information and advice, one to one and telephone befriending; social and exercise clubs, dementia support and support after hospital discharge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £77,500 from 2 government contract(s) and £73,250 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
143 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North East Lincolnshire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDAH NAVEEN | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Rigby | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kristine Green | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rob Walsh | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BATESON | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Swales | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
RAY OXBY | Trustee | 19 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANN MAGGS MBE | Trustee | 20 July 2009 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202.98k | £306.55k | £207.10k | £365.38k | £253.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £191.83k | £186.61k | £243.31k | £265.48k | £277.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £10.00k | N/A | £35.00k | N/A | £77.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £45.00k | N/A | £75.00k | £73.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 21 Jan 2015 as amended on 18 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE OVER 18 AFFECTED BY ISOLATION, LIVING IN THE BOROUGH OF NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE WITHIN THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE AND PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1. THE PROVISION OF A BEFRIENDING AND VISITING SERVICE 2. THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR CARERS; AND 3. THE TRAINING OF VOLUNTEERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6-7 aspen court
GRIMSBY
cleethorpes
cleethorpes
n e lincs
DN35 0SJ
- Phone:
- 01472231613
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window