CHRISTIAN HERITAGE LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hosting of walks, lectures and discussions on Apologetics and Christian heritage and to conduct Christian heritage guided tours of the UK and continental Europe,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 March 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Gordon Brownell | Trustee | 13 July 2015 |
|
|||||||
Professor Anthony Nigel Sydney Lane | Trustee | 13 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||
PETER GREYLING | Trustee | 03 March 2015 |
|
|||||||
Sir Charles James Hoare Bt. | Trustee | 06 January 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.97k | £53.78k | £94.15k | £100.71k | £164.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.20k | £36.53k | £113.55k | £126.11k | £154.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £9.94k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 03 MAR 2015 AMENDED ON 21/08/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AS EXPRESSED IN THE DOCTRINAL BASIS IN THE APPENDIX, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE. THE BASIS SHALL BE THE FUNDAMENTAL TRUTHS OF CHRISTIANITY, AS REVEALED IN HOLY SCRIPTURE, INCLUDING: A) THERE IS ONE GOD IN THREE PERSONS, THE FATHER, THE SON AND THE HOLY SPIRIT. GOD IS SOVEREIGN IN CREATION, REVELATION, REDEMPTION AND FINAL JUDGEMENT. B) THE BIBLE, AS ORIGINALLY GIVEN, IS THE INSPIRED AND INFALLIBLE WORD OF GOD. IT IS THE SUPREME AUTHORITY IN ALL MATTERS OF BELIEF AND BEHAVIOUR. C) SINCE THE FALL, THE WHOLE OF HUMANKIND IS SINFUL AND GUILTY, SO THAT EVERYONE IS SUBJECT TO GOD'S WRATH AND CONDEMNATION. D) THE LORD JESUS CHRIST, GOD'S INCARNATE SON, IS FULLY GOD; HE WAS BORN OF A VIRGIN; HIS HUMANITY IS REAL AND SINLESS; HE DIED ON THE CROSS, WAS RAISED BODILY FROM DEATH AND IS NOW REIGNING OVER HEAVEN AND EARTH. E) SINFUL HUMAN BEINGS ARE REDEEMED FROM THE GUILT, PENALTY AND POWER OF SIN ONLY THROUGH THE SACRIFICIAL DEATH ONCE AND FOR ALL TIME OF THEIR REPRESENTATIVE AND SUBSTITUTE, JESUS CHRIST, THE ONLY MEDIATOR BETWEEN THEM AND GOD. F) THOSE WHO BELIEVE IN CHRIST ARE PARDONED ALL THEIR SINS AND ACCEPTED IN GOD'S SIGHT ONLY BECAUSE OF THE RIGHTEOUSNESS OF CHRIST CREDITED TO THEM; THIS JUSTIFICATION IS GOD'S ACT OF UNDESERVED MERCY, RECEIVED SOLELY BY TRUST IN HIM AND NOT BY THEIR OWN EFFORTS. G) THE HOLY SPIRIT ALONE MAKES THE WORK OF CHRIST EFFECTIVE TO INDIVIDUAL SINNERS, ENABLING THEM TO TURN TO GOD FROM THEIR SIN AND TO TRUST IN JESUS CHRIST. H) THE HOLY SPIRIT LIVES IN ALL THOSE HE HAS REGENERATED. HE MAKES THEM INCREASINGLY CHRISTLIKE IN CHARACTER AND BEHAVIOUR AND GIVES THEM POWER FOR THEIR WITNESS IN THE WORLD. I) THE ONE HOLY UNIVERSAL CHURCH IS THE BODY OF CHRIST, TO WHICH ALL TRUE BELIEVERS BELONG. K) THE LORD JESUS CHRIST WILL RETURN IN PERSON, TO JUDGE EVERYONE, TO EXECUTE GOD'S JUST CONDEMNATION ON THOSE WHO HAVE NOT REPENTED AND TO RECEIVE THE REDEEMED TO ETERNAL GLORY.
Area of benefit
IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Upper Meadow
Hedgerley Lane
GERRARDS CROSS
SL9 7EY
- Phone:
- 07580877887
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window