Financial history TURN TO STARBOARD

Charity Number: 1161201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £362.72k £479.99k £382.36k £682.68k £893.40k
Total expenditure £470.14k £486.31k £547.95k £661.26k £700.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £104.19k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £45.52k £148.07k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £96.60k £258.99k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £539.39k £482.27k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £1.17k £4.07k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £649.40k £659.56k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £11.86k £40.84k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £126.18k £4.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0