Trustees HOSTAGE INTERNATIONAL
Charity number: 1161072

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Donald Melville McGown | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Katharine Gleadhall | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Niall Andrew McEnery MacGinnis | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Brandon | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jantine Van Hervijnen | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Pulina Whitaker | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Browne | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Anne Bassett | Trustee | 27 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Michael Donald Millward | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP BIGLEY CERT ED | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.