Financial history STUDENT ROBOTICS

Charity number: 1163168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £531 £1.38k £12.59k £20.94k £9.43k
Total expenditure £5.36k £10.11k £7.36k £13.95k £11.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A