CORTON HOUSE & BREWSTER COURT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide housing accommodation and services to older persons
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- THE BREWSTER CHARITY (Working name)
- THE JOSIAH AND MARY BREWSTER CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Brocklebank | Chair | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Denise Forder | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jack Minns | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jane Breame | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Marian George | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Phillips | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Grace Macdonald | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Guthrie | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Terence Cotton | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Verney | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £243.76k | £236.47k | £237.33k | £272.77k | £319.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216.63k | £205.19k | £181.39k | £210.28k | £330.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Jan 2015 as amended on 04 Feb 2025 as amended on 04 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
3.1 The objects of the CIO are: 3.1.1 To benefit people of limited means born or resident in the counties of Norfolk or Suffolk, who by reason of age, infirmity, sickness, poor health, misadventure or adversity are in special need of help or otherwise require assistance, or for such charitable purposes as are in the opinion of the trustees incidental to or connected with the aforesaid. 3.1.2 To carry on for the benefit of the community of Norfolk and Suffolk the business of providing and managing care, housing, accommodation and associated facilities, amenities and services for older people. The words "sickness, poor health" have been added to the existing object, and a second object has been added.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leathes Prior
74 The Close
Norwich
Norfolk
NR1 4DR
- Phone:
- 01603 610911
- Email:
- rguthrie@leathesprior.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window