Financial history EAST LONDON MUSIC GROUP

Charity number: 1160841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £18.24k £9.21k £27.09k £44.88k £26.80k
Total expenditure £8.33k £9.08k £40.40k £55.40k £12.44k
Income from government contracts £3.65k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A