YOUNG NORFOLK ARTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to advance the education of young people in Norfolk particularly in the fields of the performing ,literary and visual arts; giving young people from diverse backgrounds many different platforms for performance and exhibition in a wide variety of art forms; and enabling them to learn a variety of educational and life skills through participation in creative activity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £11,300 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 28 July 2015: CIO registration
- 25 April 2023: Funds received from 1062453 THE BUSENHART - MORGAN - EVANS FOUNDATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEFFAN DANIEL ANDERSON GRIFFITHS MA | Chair | 30 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Elanor Ivy Reeves | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mary Courtney Quick Butwright BA,MA | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Ruth Palmer MA BA | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
NINA NANNAR | Trustee | 30 September 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.66k | £123.73k | £124.59k | £82.34k | £36.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.57k | £93.18k | £109.46k | £115.07k | £92.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £54.61k | £40.15k | £90.80k | £40.70k | £11.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 28 Jul 2015 as amended on 11 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR IN THE FIELDS OF THE PERFORMING, LITERARY AND VISUAL ARTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Norwich Arts Centre
51 St. Benedicts Street
NORWICH
Norfolk
NR2 4PG
- Phone:
- 01603660352
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window