Financial history THE ERAYIM AID TRUST UK

Charity number: 1163524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £19.11k £5.17k £4.34k £10.17k £2.77k
Total expenditure £11.92k £6.43k £3.72k £1.94k £7.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A