THE NIKKI WATERHOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 1160492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

For the public benefit, the relief and assistance of children in need of financial or material assistance within the United Kingdom who are victims of war and natural disaster or catastrophe. The Nikki Waterhouse Trust will look to supply them with food, clothing and financial aid.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £24,853
Total expenditure: £28,778

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 February 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE NICKI WATERHOUSE TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN FREDERICK WATERHOUSE Chair 13 February 2015
None on record
Kathryn Huscroft Trustee 07 February 2024
None on record
Chloe Louise Waterhouse Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record
KEVIN PAUL HOLLINRAKE Trustee 13 February 2015
None on record
MARTIN JOHN ROBINSON Trustee 13 February 2015
None on record
GLYNIS FREW Trustee 13 February 2015
THE CYRENIANS LTD
Received: On time
EDWARD ANTHONY JONES Trustee 13 February 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £18.65k £4.60k £15.02k £4.80k £24.85k
Total expenditure £46.72k £6.14k £12.88k £22.15k £28.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CRAYKE HALL
CHURCH HILL
CRAYKE
YORK
YO61 4TA
Phone:
07881821485