CATHOLIC AGENCY FOR OVERSEAS DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1160384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

CAFOD is the official aid agency of the Catholic Church in England & Wales. We: - work with communities in the global South to overcome poverty - protect lives & relieve suffering during emergencies - raise awareness of the causes of poverty to inspire a commitment to lasting change - challenge those with power to adopt policies and behaviour that promote justice & end poverty

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Afghanistan
  • Bangladesh
  • Bolivia
  • Brazil
  • Burma
  • Cambodia
  • Colombia
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • El Salvador
  • Eritrea
  • Eswatini
  • Ethiopia
  • Guatemala
  • Honduras
  • India
  • Indonesia
  • Israel
  • Jordan
  • Kenya
  • Lebanon
  • Liberia
  • Mozambique
  • Niger
  • Nigeria
  • Occupied Palestinian Territories
  • Pakistan
  • Peru
  • Philippines
  • Poland
  • Romania
  • Sierra Leone
  • Somalia
  • South Sudan
  • Sri Lanka
  • Sudan
  • Syria
  • Turkey
  • Uganda
  • Ukraine
  • Venezuela
  • Yemen
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 November 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CAFOD (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rt Rev Stephen James Lawrence Wright Chair 15 March 2021
ST CUTHBERT'S COLLEGE USHAW
Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Maureen Kotalawela Trustee 12 February 2025
None on record
Matthew William Maslen Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
George William Fitzsimons Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Rev Tom Neylon Bishop Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Graham O'Sullivan Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Maveen Pereira Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Rev George Dhanasegaran Sigamoney Trustee 21 April 2021
None on record
Gabriela Flores Zavala Trustee 29 March 2021
None on record
Rosanne Mary Beatrix Kay Trustee 29 March 2021
None on record
Rev Mark Odion Trustee 02 December 2019
None on record
Mary Veronica Ward Trustee 20 February 2017
None on record
Professor Karen Kilby Trustee 20 February 2017
None on record
DOMINIC JERMEY OBE CVO Trustee 09 December 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £45.44m £52.40m £50.54m £67.92m £47.93m
Total expenditure £45.93m £48.94m £49.81m £66.27m £59.17m
Income from government contracts £90.80k £2.37m £181.93k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.22m £2.37m £1.07m N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £33.67m £36.99m £37.96m £53.42m £34.73m
Income - Other trading activities £37.00k £0 £23.00k £11.00k £15.00k
Income - Charitable activities £11.63m £15.29m £12.47m £14.22m £12.58m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £108.00k £48.00k £75.00k £271.00k £488.00k
Income - Other £0 £76.00k £8.00k £0 £115.00k
Income - Legacies £10.52k £11.49m £11.00m £11.18m £8.47m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £40.29m £43.12m £43.49m £59.42m £51.87m
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.65m £5.83m £6.33m £6.85m £7.31m
Expenditure - Governance £550.00k £515.00k £386.00k £478.00k £523.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £21.65m £26.53m £27.22m £38.44m £33.88m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £10.40m £9.95m £9.65m £9.35m £9.25m
Long-term investments £4.02m £4.13m £4.19m £2.65m £756.00k
Other assets £12.95m £19.10m £21.92m £25.38m £15.13m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£579.00k -£473.00k -£129.00k -£81.00k -£38.00k
Total liabilities £8.03m £10.36m £12.50m £12.57m £11.53m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 13 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 February 2022 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 29 SEPTEMBER 1982 AS AMENDED BY DEEDS OF VARIATION DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 1983, 28 SEPTEMBER 1984, 21 FEBRUARY 2009 AND 12 MARCH 2009.
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. (4) THE RELIEF AND PREVENTION OF SICKNESS DISEASE AND PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITY THROUGHOUT THE WORLD. (5) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE UNITED KINGDOM COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Registration history
  • 10 November 1982 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
C A F O D
ROMERO HOUSE
55 WESTMINSTER BRIDGE ROAD
LONDON
SE1 7JB
Phone:
020 7733 7900