THE CASTLE HOUSE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Art Museum open to the public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,964 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Essex
Governance
- 01 March 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hugo Richard Lamond Parker | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Lady Vanessa Petronel Watson | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JAMES CAMPBELL JOHNSTON | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bryony Everard Maynard | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Parker | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles Aldous KC | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £258.84k | £303.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £227.85k | £291.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 DEC 2014 as amended on 27 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE FOR THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ARTS MUSEUM AT CASTLE HOUSE, DEDHAM, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO BE KNOWN AS THE SIR ALFRED MUNNING'S ART MUSEUM FOR THE PURPOSE OF THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE COLLECTION ("THE COLLECTION") OPEN TO THE PUBLIC OF THE WORKS OF ART MADE BY SIR ALFRED MUNNINGS AND, IN ADDITION, THE CONTENTS OF CASTLE HOUSE BEING CHATTELS, FURNITURE, EQUIPMENT AND INVESTMENTS TO BE USED AS THE NUCLEUS OF THE MUSEUM.
Linked charities
- 01 March 1968 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Castle House
Castle Hill
Dedham
COLCHESTER
CO7 6AZ
- Phone:
- 01206 322127
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window