JEREMY SINGER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity will promote the education of underprivileged young persons to provide them with opportunities to better succeed in life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 July 2015: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JACK DONALD SINGER | Chair | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
The Hon Mrs EVELYN ANNE singer | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL SAMUEL PHILIP GARVIN | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
JULIET ROSALIND CLAIRE RAISSA SINGER | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £10.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £6.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 January 2022 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 NOV 2014 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 12/06/2015
Charitable objects
1 FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF UNDERPRIVILEGED YOUNG PERSONS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION. 2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT. 3 TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN EDUCATION THAT THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD. 4 THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, TO INCLUDE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN PROVISION OF COURSES, LECTURES AND DEMONSTRATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Campden Hill Court
Campden Hill Road
LONDON
W8 7HU
- Phone:
- 02079379406
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window