KINGS LYNN CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our purpose is to spread God's kingdom in a fallen world. This entails fostering the spiritual, social and physical welfare of members and friends of the church along with those in the local community with whom we have contact. We believe that God in Christ loves all people and desires that all turn to him as the source of all truth to find objective meaning, value and purpose to life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 15 April 2015: CIO registration
- REFFLEY COMMUNITY CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NOEL MCGIVERN | Chair | 16 February 2025 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL ARTHUR EDWARD ALDIS | Trustee | 16 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn May Fysh | Trustee | 16 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MOORE | Trustee | 16 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
ISOBEL HULDAH PARKER | Trustee | 16 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Scott | Trustee | 16 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Steve Wilson | Trustee | 16 February 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.01k | £39.69k | £43.44k | £41.49k | £42.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.67k | £28.17k | £42.32k | £40.66k | £44.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £100 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 15 Apr 2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS PART OF THE CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE INC AND THE DISTRICT PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN NORTHERN ENGLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 GRAFTON ROAD
KING'S LYNN
PE30 3EY
- Phone:
- 01553 673381
- Email:
- augustbaah@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window