Financial history THE HEPWORTH SILVER PRIZE BAND

Charity number: 1161654
Charity reporting is up to date (65 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £29.76k £49.03k £33.92k £68.56k £71.42k
Total expenditure £35.55k £12.24k £40.98k £85.30k £77.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.00k £19.34k N/A N/A N/A