Financial history THE PAH FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1160542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £264.35k £61.34k £112.72k £102.39k £301.59k
Total expenditure £28.61k £42.36k £79.88k £83.65k £202.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A