COMMUNITY FURNITURE AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing donated furniture to the poorest in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £2,600 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Blaenau Gwent
- Bridgend
- Cardiff
- City Of Swansea
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Neath Port Talbot
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 09 October 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIAN MACLEOD PAUL CASH Bca | Chair | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Oliver Richard Reginald Liddard | Trustee | 23 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Mary Nott | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rachel Davies | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Bernard Frederick Howard Tiltman | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Huw Marshall | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|||||||
Liam Joseph Alleyne | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Louise Heppenstall | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Matthias Jon Liddard | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
MARIANNE EMMA CASH Bca | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.60k | £4.96k | £5.72k | £2.55k | £7.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.60k | £5.09k | £4.00k | £4.49k | £9.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 02 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 02 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN NEED IN THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF BRIDGEND AND SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE POOR OR IN HOUSING NEED IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPLYING THEM WITH FURNITURE AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 MEADOW STREET
PONTYCYMER
BRIDGEND
CF32 8HG
- Phone:
- 01656870149
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window