THE CWMBRAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Cwmbran Trust aims to benefit the community of Cwmbran Town in such charitable ways as the trustees think fit and in particular, the advancement of education, the provision of social amenities and the relief of povety, distress or sickness
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Torfaen
Governance
- 12 January 1977: Standard registration
- GIRLING CWMBRAN TRUST (Working name)
- THE GIRLING TRUST (Working name)
- GIRLING (CWMBRAN) TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Poulton | Chair | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Williams | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Joanne Gauden | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
Mr JOHN CUNNINGHAM | Trustee | 27 February 2017 |
|
|||||||
Fiona Cross Councillor | Trustee | 27 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||
KENNETH L MADDOX | Trustee | 12 March 1992 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID JOHN BASSETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.51k | £116.19k | £127.11k | £120.59k | £130.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.30k | £46.90k | £64.41k | £93.51k | £97.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 DECEMBER 1976 AND VARIED BY A SCHEME DATED 18 MARCH 1998 AND BY A RESOLUTION PASSED 21 SEPTEMBER 2009.
Charitable objects
ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OF PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF THE TOWN OF CWMBRAN IN THE COUNTY OF GWENT AND IN PARTICULAR: 1) THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL AMENITIES; 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND 3) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
TOWN OF CWMBRAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CWMBRAN TRUST C/o
MERITOR
HVBS (UK) LTD
GRANGE ROAD
CWMBRAN
NP44 3XU
- Phone:
- 01633 834057
- Email:
- gifts@cwmbrantrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window