PUBLIC HEALTH REGISTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UKPHR keeps a register of persons practising in the multi-disciplinary public health profession in the UK. UKPHR supervises the behaviour and conduct of the persons for the time being included in the register of persons practising in the multi-disciplinary public health profession in the UK. UKPHR aims to protect the public from harm and promote improved health and wellbeing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £95,185 from 14 government contract(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 July 2015: Standard registration
- UKPHR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin James Humphrey | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Featherstone | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marriane Luella Coward | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Smith | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Matthew Sandy | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ranjit Khutan | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Susan Dowd | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Rosemary King | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Herbert Evans | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr Jenny Douglas | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Andrew Philip Jones | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN VERNON | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr VIVIENNE MARILYN SPELLER | Trustee | 25 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £376.72k | £382.94k | £340.10k | £404.30k | £466.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £324.41k | £338.15k | £418.24k | £527.94k | £498.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £25.05k | N/A | £95.19k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £48.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/05/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/02/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/02/2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF ALL PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY: (A) KEEPING A REGISTER OF PERSONS PRACTISING IN THE MULTI-DISCIPLINARY PUBLIC HEALTH PROFESSION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM; (B) SUPERVISING THE BEHAVIOUR AND CONDUCT OF THE PERSONS FOR THE TIME BEING INCLUDED IN THE REGISTER OF PERSONS PRACTISING IN THE MULTI-DISCIPLINARY PUBLIC HEALTH PROFESSION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM; (C) PROTECTING THE PUBLIC FROM HARM, PROMOTING IMPROVED HEALTH AND WELLBEING AND REDUCING HEALTH INEQUALITIES BETWEEN AND WITHIN COMMUNITIES; AND (D) THE DOING OF ALL SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS AND THAT ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UKPHR
SUITE 16A
MCLAREN BUILDING
46 THE PRIORY QUEENSWAY
BIRMINGHAM
- Phone:
- 01212964370
- Email:
- register@ukphr.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window