THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW BISHOPTHORPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal function of this charity is to promote in the parish the whole mission of the Church. The Parochial Church Council is governed by the Parochial Church Councils (Powers) measure 1956 and the Church Representation Rules (contained in Schedule 3 to the Synodical Government Measure 1969 as amended).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of York
Governance
- 21 May 2015: Previously excepted registration
- ST ANDREW'S PCC, BISHOPTHORPE (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE HALL | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN HALL | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Sutton | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin David Sutton | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Matthew Ian James Probert | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Dunn | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
TOM WHALEY | Trustee | 01 January 1992 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.01k | £53.26k | £84.41k | £66.13k | £72.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.79k | £60.44k | £75.84k | £62.78k | £61.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.31k | N/A | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Campleshon Road
York
YO23 1EY
- Phone:
- 07816448030
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window