Accounts and annual returns MANCHESTER CENTRE FOR THE STUDY OF CHRISTIANITY AND ISLAM

Charity number: 1163648
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 23 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 23 December 2024 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2023 25 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 25 March 2024 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2021 07 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 07 March 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2020 17 May 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 17 May 2021 17 days late