SEFTON NORTH DEANERY

Charity Number: 1161582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of the Christian faith in particular but not exclusively by promoting Christian mission and/or growth within the Sefton Deanery by the distribution of grants to or via the Church of England parishes within the Deanery.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £60,670
Total expenditure: £49,740

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Sefton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 May 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • SEFTON DEANERY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev ANNE ELIZABETH TAYLOR Chair 15 March 2016
ST PETER'S FORMBY EDUCATIONAL TRUST 2015
Received: On time
Rev Mark Roger Stanford Trustee 08 July 2022
ASHTON MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
BERYL FRANCES HOWARD Trustee 27 September 2021
FRIENDS OF MERCHANT TAYLORS' SCHOOL FOR GIRLS CROSBY
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MARY DUFF CHESTNUTT LLB Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Rev NATHAN ANDREW THORPE Trustee 11 September 2020
None on record
BRUCE LOCK HUBBARD Trustee 13 June 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, MAGHULL, LIVERPOOL
Received: On time
THE ROTARY CLUB OF MAGHULL & AUGHTON TRUST FUND
Received: On time
HELEN MIRANDA HUNTER BSc MA Trustee 25 September 2017
None on record
Rev AMANDA JANE COPPLESTONE BRUCE Trustee 29 June 2017
None on record
ZORINA ANNETTE JONES BA MA Trustee 01 April 2015
HALSALL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE GREAT CROSBY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.32k £11.58k £6.20k £0 £60.67k
Total expenditure £21.10k £19.50k £660 £31.53k £49.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 Pinfold Close
SOUTHPORT
Merseyside
PR8 3QQ
Phone:
01704578737
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available