SOUTHAMPTON CITY MISSION (CIO)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SCM exists to serve and to share with the churches of Southampton in their task of bringing the love of Jesus to the city. SCM provides food and clothing on an emergency basis using Food and Clothing Banks at local churches across the city. SCM works alongside schools in educating children in the teachings of Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£751,248
Donations and legacies | £709.17k | |
Charitable activities | £25.01k | |
Other trading activities | £2.69k | |
Investments | £14.38k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£791,298
Raising funds | £13.07k | |
Charitable activities | £778.23k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £60,000 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £13.07k | |
Charitable expenditure | £778.23k |
People

9 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
250 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 10 June 2015: CIO registration
- SCM(CIO) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS FORD | Chair | 10 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Chapman | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Christopher Evans | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Anne Holt | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mary Willis | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Temitayo Oloruntuyi | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Duff | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kelvin Taylor | Trustee | 16 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £475.31k | £749.05k | £522.59k | £886.49k | £751.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £457.23k | £519.90k | £559.98k | £731.84k | £791.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £25.75k | £10.00k | £63.30k | £60.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £746.37k | £515.06k | £863.77k | £709.17k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £1.15k | £1.47k | £3.33k | £2.69k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £4.43k | £13.85k | £25.01k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £1.53k | £1.62k | £5.55k | £14.38k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £515.88k | £555.80k | £723.10k | £778.23k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £4.02k | £4.19k | £8.74k | £13.07k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £728 | £959 | £900 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £10.15k | £22.79k | £64.64k | £328.54k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £170.39k | £331.02k | £321.96k | £47.72k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £317.95k | £107.19k | £217.82k | £194.02k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £13.28k | £13.19k | £6.94k | £7.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 Jun 2015 as amended on 26 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIC TENETS OF HISTORICAL BIBLICAL CHRISTIANITY. 2. TO PREVENT AND RELIEVE POVERTY IN THE CITY OF SOUTHAMPTON AND ITS NEIGHBOURING AREA . 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR PERSONS OF ANY AGE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND MORAL CAPABILITIES THROUGH WORK IN SCHOOLS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AND BY SUPPORTING OTHER CHARITIES IN ENGLAND, THE UK OR ABROAD. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE PURPOSES THE CIO WILL SHOW THE LOVE OF JESUS CHRIST IN A PRACTICAL WAY, COMBINING EVANGELISM WITH SOCIAL CARE AND EDUCATION TO ENSURE THAT THE MESSAGE OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL REACHES OUT TO THE HEARTS OF ALL PEOPLE, IRRESPECTIVE OF GENDER, COLOUR, RACE, ETHNIC ORIGIN OR FAITH (OR NONE).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Southampton City Mission
Unit 5
Second Avenue
SOUTHAMPTON
SO15 0LP
- Phone:
- 023 8055 0435
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window