SIMPLEGIFTS: UNITARIAN CENTRE FOR SOCIAL ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run community programming from our Bethnal Green, East London premises. Our programmes - including our After School Club, New Neighbours/Old Neighbours Lunch, and ESOL classes - are all run by a team of dedicated volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £23,437 from 4 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 25 June 2015: CIO registration
- SIMPLEGIFTS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Brown | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Roy Clark | Trustee | 23 March 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Rev MARTIN WHITELL | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.84k | £26.67k | £45.79k | £32.24k | £49.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.27k | £17.99k | £15.59k | £28.49k | £32.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £10.00k | £24.41k | £13.07k | £23.44k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 September 2022 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 25 September 2022 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 February 2022 | 202 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 17 February 2022 | 202 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 25 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
1. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF BETHNAL GREEN, EAST LONDON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. 2. TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS 3. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 4. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY OF BETHNAL GREEN, EAST LONDON IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. 5. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
117 MANSFORD STREET
LONDON
E2 6LX
- Phone:
- 07411114831
- Email:
- info@simplegiftsucsa.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window