THE WAVE PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Wave Project runs award-winning surf therapy programmes for children aged 8-24 in the UK. Using a combination of qualified staff and trained volunteers, we run an evidence-based programme of peer-led surfing lessons that helps children and young adults to improve their emotional wellbeing. We also run a Beach School project for children at risk of exclusion from school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income:
£1,616,777
Donations and legacies | £1.17m | |
Charitable activities | £350.28k | |
Other trading activities | £95.08k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,609,089
Raising funds | £570 | |
Charitable activities | £1.50m | |
Other | £103.78k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £104.35k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.50m | |
Retained for future use | £7.69k |
People

38 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
1600 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brett Simpson | Chair | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Louise Keylock | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alunn LLoyd Jones | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Parker | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gary James Dreghorn | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Graham Murphy | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alison Oliver | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Munday | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Robertson | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £978.82k | £1.26m | £1.48m | £1.74m | £1.62m | |
|
Total expenditure | £973.48k | £1.07m | £1.66m | £1.32m | £1.61m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £1.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.92k | £124.80k | £78.42k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £168.86k | £930.06k | £1.13m | £1.48m | £1.17m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £100.98k | £83.54k | £115.08k | £83.07k | £95.08k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £708.97k | £243.62k | £233.64k | £173.46k | £350.28k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £841.09k | £1.04m | £1.60m | £1.23m | £1.50m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £132.39k | £37.39k | £62.80k | £87.92k | £570 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £36.81k | £22.72k | £32.10k | £0 | £61.45k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £103.78k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £70.43k | £86.83k | £68.38k | £70.84k | £58.07k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £251.34k | £415.43k | £219.83k | £647.97k | £726.52k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £62.50k | £59.44k | £30.94k | £46.57k | £104.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 03 June 2021 | 185 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 03 June 2021 | 185 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/08/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE, RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) THOSE AFFECTED BY DISABILITY, ILLNESS, MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS, SOCIAL EXCLUSION, LOW SELF-ESTEEM OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE OR DIFFICULTY INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) BY; (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THEIR EDUCATION AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR SKILLS, CAPABILITIES AND CONFIDENCE; IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INSTRUCTION IN AND FACILITIES FOR SURFING AND OTHER RELATED SPORTS; AND 2. TO ADVANCE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Fore Street
Newquay
CORNWALL
TR7 1LN
- Phone:
- 01637820830
- Email:
- info@waveproject.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window