STEPPING STONES (LUTON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with vulnerable women and their children to improve their health and wellbeing, improve their life prospects and create stronger and more cohesive families. Our work is primarily carried out in Luton and Bedfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £203,946 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Luton
Governance
- 23 June 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Brown | Chair | 20 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Victor Akunna | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Hackwood | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Seyefar Clement | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aimee Clarke | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire McInally | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Jane Hughes | Trustee | 28 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £552.94k | £635.05k | £440.65k | £440.65k | £415.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £560.88k | £498.68k | £500.13k | £500.13k | £476.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £75.01k | £76.51k | N/A | £202.22k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £138.89k | £39.29k | £40.83k | £202.22k | £203.95k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £197.08k | £27.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £355.53k | £607.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £27.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £330 | £91 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £550.46k | £498.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £10.42k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.73k | £2.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 JUN 2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 JUN 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT SERVICES OF ANY KIND FOR WOMEN AND THEIR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES SUFFERING FROM DRUG ADDICTION AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE AND WHO MAY HAVE OFFENDED OR RE-OFFENDED OR BE VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE, LIVING IN LUTON OR SUCH OTHER PARTS OF BEDFORDSHIRE OR THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
STEPPING STONES
9A GEORGE STREET WEST
LUTON
LU1 2BJ
- Phone:
- 01582457114
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window