Financial history FOUNDERS4SCHOOLS

Charity number: 1162197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £2.04m £1.32m £1.41m £1.19m £1.34m
Total expenditure £1.22m £1.34m £1.54m £1.26m £1.33m
Income from government contracts N/A £10.70k £24.00k £4.00k N/A
Income from government grants £91.54k £420.62k £175.00k £87.50k £125.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.04m £1.26m £1.17m £919.60k £964.13k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £29.78k £235.92k £272.92k £377.89k
Income - Charitable activities £550 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £410 £79 £0 £2 £299
Income - Other £296 £32.55k £9.04k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.08m £1.11m £1.19m £1.19m £1.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £139.73k £174.98k £346.89k £71.94k £314.50k
Expenditure - Governance £8.91k £12.05k £14.56k £26.30k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £52.26k £0 £0 £0