FOUNDERS4SCHOOLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance and promote the education of people under the age of 25 in such ways as the charity trustees from time to time think fit including by promoting, facilitating and assisting in the provision of careers education and advice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£1,342,318
Donations and legacies | £964.13k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £377.89k | |
Investments | £299 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,326,418
Raising funds | £314.50k | |
Charitable activities | £1.01m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £124,999 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £314.50k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.01m | |
Retained for future use | £15.90k |
People

14 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
37539 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 June 2015: CIO registration
- F4S (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHERRY LEIGH COUTU | Chair | 16 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alexander David George Marsh | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Paul Rouse | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julian Philip Palmer | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Stuart Watson | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Divesh Chandiramani | Trustee | 25 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Nooriala | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Von Stackelberg | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Coyle | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Hannaford | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.04m | £1.32m | £1.41m | £1.19m | £1.34m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.22m | £1.34m | £1.54m | £1.26m | £1.33m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £10.70k | £24.00k | £4.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £91.54k | £420.62k | £175.00k | £87.50k | £125.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.04m | £1.26m | £1.17m | £919.60k | £964.13k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £29.78k | £235.92k | £272.92k | £377.89k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £550 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £410 | £79 | £0 | £2 | £299 | |
|
Income - Other | £296 | £32.55k | £9.04k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.08m | £1.11m | £1.19m | £1.19m | £1.01m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £139.73k | £174.98k | £346.89k | £71.94k | £314.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.91k | £12.05k | £14.56k | £26.30k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £52.26k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £672.00k | £6.52k | £8.63k | £15.79k | £18.41k | |
|
Long-term investments | £840.55k | £840.45k | £840.45k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £675.35k | £563.93k | £561.52k | £554.05k | £643.05k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £340.38k | £246.67k | £369.13k | £433.83k | £509.54k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Jun 2015 as amended on 02 May 2023
Charitable objects
3.1 The objects of the CIO are to advance and promote the education of: 3.1.1 young people under the age of 25, with a focus on those from under-represented, under-served and diverse communities; and 3.1.2 people of any age in digital skills, including those employed in micro, SME and large organisations, in such ways as the charity trustees from time to time think fit including by promoting, facilitating and assisting in the provision of careers and skills related education and advice with the intention of: (i) encouraging and enabling young people to leave formal education with a skill set that is appropriate for or consistent with future jobs; and (ii) encouraging and enabling people of any age to advance their skills, reduce the skills gap, and to support young people to develop their employability skills. 3.2 The CIO will advance and promote its objects with particular reference to entrepreneurship in the fields of technology, applied sciences and related subjects; or other areas and fields as considered appropriate by the trustees from time to time. 3.3 Nothing in this constitution shall authorise an application of the property of the CIO for a purpose which is not charitable in accordance with section 7 of the Charities and Trustee Investment (Scotland) Act 2005 and section 2 of the Charities Act (Northern Ireland) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DIXON WILSON
CHARTERED ACCOUNTANTS
22 CHANCERY LANE
LONDON
WC2A 1LS
- Phone:
- 07740534954
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window