Trustees FRIMLEY FUEL ALLOTMENTS CIO
Charity number: 1161717

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan McClafferty | Chair | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
CLIFF BETTON | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Darren Bateman | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Murray Chesterton Rowlands | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert William Lee | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Jane Glauert | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Damon Cary Walker | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Parker | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Salma Jane Sams | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GEDDES PATERSON OBE | Trustee | 22 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIMON RICHARD STRACHAN | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
RODNEY BATES | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARYANN THOMSON | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY GERTRUDE KEYS | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.