Financial history South Worcestershire Methodist Circuit

Charity Number: 1164581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £325.31k £347.72k £343.76k £512.42k £771.63k
Total expenditure £325.14k £322.00k £347.85k £280.65k £342.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £1.97k £400
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £300.01k £298.37k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £13.22k £23.08k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £197.23k £449.79k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £278.90k £332.16k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £3.54k £1.32k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £1.76k £10.12k