SUSSEX BADGER VACCINATION PROJECT LIMITED

Charity Number: 1163605
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sussex Badger Vaccination Project vaccinate badgers against bovine tuberculosis in Sussex.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £5,869

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 September 2015: Standard registration
  • 15 July 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 15 July 2024: Funds transferred to 1108880 EAST SUSSEX WRAS LTD
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SUSSEX BADGER VACCINATION PROJECT (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £2.61k £2.01k £251 £0 £0
Total expenditure £3.36k £1.21k £2.72k £839 £5.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2023 27 June 2024 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 11 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 15 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 03 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required