LEICESTERSHIRE & RUTLAND ORGANISATION FOR THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hospice care with the aim of enhancing the quality of life of patients with cancer, progressive neurological disease and other conditions, and for whom curative treatment is no longer possible. Patients are aged 18 years and upwards. Areas of activity: In-patient Ward (31 beds), Clinics:Community Nurse Specialists, DayTherapy, Counselling, Lymphoedema Clinics, Education/Training, Research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£15,699,578
Donations and legacies | £5.64m | |
Charitable activities | £4.30m | |
Other trading activities | £5.57m | |
Investments | £182.32k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£19,025,795
Raising funds | £5.84m | |
Charitable activities | £13.18m | |
Other | £0 |
-£404,609 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £4,303,651 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.84m | |
Charitable expenditure | £13.18m |
People

382 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
1229 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 4 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Rutland
Governance
- 30 March 1977: Standard registration
- 12 December 2016: Funds received from 1117823 MARGARET ELUNED JAMES CHARITABLE TRUST
- 02 July 2020: Funds received from 1058606 LEICESTERSHIRE LYMPHOEDEMA SUPPORT GROUP
- 14 June 2022: Funds received from 517532 MIDLAND FESTIVAL CHORUS
- 09 February 2023: Funds received from 1065011 MARKET BOSWORTH AGRICULTURAL HORTICULTURAL AND EQU...
- 14 May 2024: Funds received from 216596 SPENCE'S PENSION CHARITY FOR MARKET BOSWORTH
- LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND HOSPICE (Working name)
- LOROS (Working name)
- LEICESTER ORGANISATION FOR THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING LIMITED (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Pinchen | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen O'Connor | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Paul Rowley | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Henry | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Katherine Mary Bradley | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Jane Poole | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Andrew Smith | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise O'Brien | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nakul Patel | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Hurwood | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Murray | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Measom | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WARREN STANT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.90m | £13.53m | £14.80m | £16.36m | £15.70m | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.70m | £14.01m | £14.97m | £16.70m | £19.03m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.50m | N/A | £3.88m | £4.30m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £6.76m | £6.60m | £6.91m | £7.55m | £5.64m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £3.68m | £3.42m | £4.26m | £4.77m | £5.57m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.30m | £3.40m | £3.50m | £3.88m | £4.30m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £157.36k | £111.96k | £128.48k | £154.78k | £182.32k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £2.95m | £1.13m | £3.33m | £4.76m | £1.89m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £11.83m | £10.96m | £11.00m | £12.12m | £13.18m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.87m | £3.06m | £3.97m | £4.58m | £5.84m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £118.35k | £120.05k | £114.60k | £125.80k | £145.14k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £31.52k | £22.53k | £32.09k | £28.24k | £22.73k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £14.00m | £13.34m | £13.31m | £13.01m | £12.21m | |
|
Long-term investments | £5.09m | £6.25m | £6.76m | £5.41m | £4.95m | |
|
Other assets | £6.39m | £5.86m | £6.22m | £7.79m | £4.58m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.23m | £1.39m | £2.17m | £2.99m | £1.58m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 24 JANUARY 1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 16 NOVEMBER 1999 as amended on 09 Nov 2010 as amended on 17 Jan 2012 as amended on 05 Jan 2023 as amended on 05 May 2023
Charitable objects
3.1. To promote the relief of sickness in such ways as the Association shall from time to time think fit, and in particular (but without prejudice to the generality of such object): 3.1.1. By establishing, maintaining and conducting residential nursing homes and day care facilities in Leicestershire and Rutland and any surrounding areas as the Association may see fit for the reception and care of persons of either sex (without regard to race or creed) who are suffering (at any age) from any chronic or terminal illness or from any disability or disease attributable to old age or from any other physical or mental infirmity, disability or disease, and so that any such home may be restricted to patients of one sex only or (whether or not so restricted as aforesaid) to patients suffering from any particular type or types of illness, disability, disease or infirmity and by providing medical care or other treatment care and attention for any such persons as aforesaid in their own homes. 3.1.2. By conducting or promoting or encouraging research into the care and treatment of persons suffering from any such illness, disability, disease or infirmity as aforesaid and particularly into the care and treatment of persons suffering from cancer or terminal illnesses and of the relatives and close friends of such persons. 3.1.3. By promoting or encouraging or assisting in the teaching or training of doctors, nurses, physiotherapists and other persons engaged in any branch of medicine, surgery, nursing or allied services, and in the teaching or training of students in any branch of medicine, surgery, nursing or allied services. 3.1.4. By providing or assisting or encouraging the provision of spiritual help and guidance for any persons resident (either as patients or otherwise) or working in any such home or homes as aforesaid.
Area of benefit
LEICESTERSHIRE & RUTLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Loros Hospice
Groby Road
LEICESTER
LE3 9QE
- Phone:
- 01162313771
- Email:
- info@loros.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window