THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, STEVENAGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all Provision of quiet space for personal prayer and contemplation Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved Teaching of Christianity Taking of Christian assemblies in schools Provision of Bible-based children's and youth work Evangelism through events, meetings and distribution of literature Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 10 April 2015: Previously excepted registration
- ST NICHOLAS, STEVENAGE (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Evelyn Margaret Wilton | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Daniel Peter Seifi - Lorimer | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Susan Jane Bailey | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Elaine Forster | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Charlotte Tina Seifi-Lorimer | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
CHRISTINE CHAMBERS | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Edward John Gerald Keene | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
Paul Graham Schimmel | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
Mark Parker | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Karen Ann Walker | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||
CATHERINE ANN BIBBY | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
STUART JOSEPH MARSHALL | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
JASON ANDREW COX | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
CHRISTOPHER MARTYN TAPLIN | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
EDWARD KAAHWA | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Michael Alan Wilton | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £641.41k | £558.83k | £148.59k | £138.53k | £100.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £616.09k | £571.02k | £167.32k | £142.31k | £108.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £201.51k | £125.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £52.37k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £13 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £439.88k | £380.97k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £0 | £571.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £750 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £616.09k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2a North Road
Stevenage
SG1 4AT
- Phone:
- 01438213587
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window