BIOTECHNOLOGY AND MEDICINE EDUCATION TRUST (BIOTECHMET)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance and development of a free, educational website explaining the history and developments in biotechnology.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 February 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Russell Ian Walters | Chair | 08 February 2016 |
|
|||||
Alireza Alidoust | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Arron Mungul | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul David Nash | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
DR Sebastien Farnaud | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER GLUCKMAN | Trustee | 08 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
JENNY MURRAY | Trustee | 08 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.38k | £201 | £56.10k | £20.06k | £10.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.91k | £21.00k | £17.53k | £28.17k | £21.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF BIOTECHMET ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY FOSTERING A GREATER UNDERSTANDING AMONG THE GENERAL PUBLIC, MEDICAL AUDIENCES AND OTHER KEY STAKEHOLDERS, ABOUT WHAT BIOTECHNOLOGY IS, WHERE IT HAS COME FROM AND ITS ROLE IN MEDICINE, INCLUDING THE RISKS AND BENEFITS, BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. THE OBJECTIVE IS TO PROVIDE TRUSTED AND RELIABLE EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES FOR PEOPLE AT VARIOUS AGE LEVELS AND WITH DIFFERING LEVELS OF KNOWLEDGE AND EXPERTISE TO FACILITATE BETTER UNDERSTANDINGS ABOUT • THE MULTIPLE TOOLS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY • WHO IS INVOLVED IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF BIOTECHNOLOGY AND ITS APPLICATION TO MEDICINE, INCLUDING THE CONTRIBUTION MADE BY WOMEN, ETHNIC MINORITIES AND PEOPLE OUTSIDE NORTH AMERICA AND WESTERN EUROPE • THE COMPLEXITIES BEHIND BIOTECHNOLOGY INNOVATION AND ITS APPLICATION TO MEDICINE • THE IMPACT OF BIOTECHNOLOGY ON MEDICAL RESEARCH, PRACTICE AND TREATMENT • WHAT RISKS AND BENEFITS BIOTECHNOLOGY BRINGS TO MEDICINE • HOW THE FIELD IS FUNDED AND REGULATED • THE IMPACT OF BIOTECHNOLOGY ON THE WORK OF CLINICIANS AND PATIENTS' HEALTH OUTCOMES • THE FUTURE DIRECTION OF BIOTECHNOLOGY IN MEDICINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 MADISON WAY
SEVENOAKS
TN13 3EF
- Phone:
- 01732451988
- Email:
- admin@biotechmet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window