POODLE NETWORK UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a UK-wide rescue, rehabilitation & rehoming charity for Poodles of any size. We are committed to the welfare of Poodles by offering owners and potential owners advice about the breed and working for the prevention of cruelty and suffering in poodles. We care for abandoned, mistreated and lost Poodles and Poodles in need of a new home, providing veterinary treatment and behavioral training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
231 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 August 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary Preece | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|||||
JULIE PATRICIA ALDCROFT | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Tamsin Aldcroft | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ethel Mills | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.59k | £26.88k | £60.24k | £55.48k | £110.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.18k | £45.82k | £41.21k | £62.41k | £95.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
A NATIONAL UK NETWORK FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF POODLES WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE AND FOSTER HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF UNWANTED POODLES AND THE TREATMENT OF POODLES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Oakwood Drive
Heaton
Bolton
Lancashire
BL1 5EE
- Phone:
- 03009997685
- Email:
- info@pnuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window