Financial history MAIDSTONE ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1163384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £49.82k £95 £41.73k £52.04k £45.04k
Total expenditure £51.51k £7.06k £41.98k £44.97k £48.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A