Financial history THE CONSTANCE FAULDS CRAWFORD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1162181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 19/08/2020 19/08/2021 19/08/2022 19/08/2023 19/08/2024
Total gross income £6.64k £3.01k £3.98k £4.38k £11.14k
Total expenditure £7.82k £5.86k £6.39k £13.54k £11.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A