HAMPTON & KEMPTON WATERWORKS RAILWAY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Restoration of historic railway
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hounslow
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 04 May 2016: Standard registration
- 23 June 2020: Funds received from 1166251 HAMPSHIRE NARROW GAUGE RAILWAY TRUST
- KEMPTON STEAM RAILWAY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Les Munckton | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Castle | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Diane Roberts | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Patrick Clode | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bernard John Chorley | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Bishop Lewis | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT LEADBETTER | Trustee | 04 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.92k | £40.64k | £44.40k | £54.27k | £48.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.72k | £32.60k | £29.07k | £51.71k | £58.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 MAR 2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 APR 2016 as amended on 19 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
4 The charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are specifically restricted to the following: For the public benefit to restore, maintain and operate part of our industrial heritage, the Hampton & Kempton Waterworks Railway, in order to - (1) Advance the education of the public about the engineering achievement and legacy of the water industry serving London and the use of dedicated rail transport to serve that industry. (2) To reconstruct and operate, as a public amenity, on the original trackbed where possible, the former narrow-gauge railway linking the preserved Kempton Park pumping engines and the River Thames at Hampton. (3) To construct a branch of the narrow-gauge railway to the mainline station at Kempton Park thus providing an environmentally friendly public transport link to a wide area of West London and beyond. (4) Provide educational and training facilities to – (a) Those engaged in the restoration and operation of the railway (b) Young persons learning early 20th century engineering skills (c) School children and others studying our industrial heritage (5) Provide environmentally friendly access to ecologically sensitive nature reserves through currently inaccessible Green Belt land.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Little Danes
The Street
BETCHWORTH
Surrey
RH3 7DJ
- Phone:
- 01932765328
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window