THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN

Charity Number: 1162338
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The primary aims of the Trust are to be an Anglican church which plays our part in seeking to help people encounter the LOVE of God, LIVE in the way of Jesus and GO in the power of the Spirit to see lives changed and communities transformed. We exist to be a city centre resourcing church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £496,466
Total expenditure: £483,865

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 June 2015: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST SWITHIN'S PCC, LINCOLN (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV JAMES PRESTWOOD Chair 05 October 2014
ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
ST SWITHIN'S COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
Thomas William Herbert Trustee 28 April 2024
ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
Gail Louise Fields Trustee 28 April 2024
ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
Dale Newman Trustee 28 April 2024
ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Michael Ross Glenfield Trustee 28 April 2024
ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
Ryan Anthony Rawlinson Trustee 28 April 2024
ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
Rev JOHN CAMERON WATT Trustee 31 January 2024
ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
DAVID ATKINSON CHARITY
Received: On time
ELIZA BENTLEY FOR CHOIR
Received: On time
CHARLES BELLWOOD CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Victoria Lawrence Trustee 25 June 2023
LINCOLN DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Received: On time
Jennifer Lorraine Moat Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Andrew Shepherd Trustee 23 April 2023
ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Benjamin Jonathan Willis Trustee 05 July 2022
ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Juliette Sophie Willis Trustee 05 July 2022
ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
Rosemary Anne Brooks Trustee 09 May 2022
ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
Callum William Roper Trustee 26 April 2021
ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
Jane Louise Pickersgill Trustee 25 April 2021
ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
John Crowder Trustee 18 October 2020
ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
Mark Perry Trustee 28 April 2019
ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
Susan Barbara Elizabeth Watt Trustee 30 April 2018
ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
THE LINCOLN DIOCESAN TRUST AND BOARD OF FINANCE LTD
Received: On time
ST SWITHIN'S COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
Dan Chard Trustee 30 April 2018
ST SWITHIN'S COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
Phil Williams Trustee 30 April 2018
None on record
RACHEL CAROL TYRRELL Trustee 24 April 2016
ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
RICHARD JOHN LAMBERT Trustee 24 April 2016
CHRISTIAN PARTNERS IN AFRICA
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £341.80k £371.64k £473.22k £476.17k £496.47k
Total expenditure £269.97k £624.22k £476.96k £408.13k £483.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.38k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Swithins Church
The Salthouse
Free School Lane
LINCOLN
LN2 1EY
Phone:
01522275067