SPECIAL YOGA FOUNDATION CIO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Special Yoga Foundation focuses on bringing yoga to special needs children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 02 September 2015: CIO registration
- 12 November 2021: Removed (Removed by application)
- 12 November 2021: Funds transferred to 1137695 ICANDANCE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £458.97k | £263.15k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £423.09k | £283.17k | £15.86k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 20 October 2020 | 355 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 20 October 2020 | 355 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 24 April 2019 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 24 April 2019 | 175 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 02 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN YOGA AND OTHER COMPLIMENTARY THERAPIES, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) TO ENCOURAGE THE TEACHING OF YOGA AND OTHER COMPLIMENTARY THERAPIES IN SCHOOLS, DAY-CARE CENTRES, ORPHANAGES AND IN CENTRES CARING FOR THOSE WITH PHYSICAL AND MENTAL DISABILITIES; B. TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR YOGA; C. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL AND PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR YOGA AND OTHER COMPLIMENTARY THERAPIES TO THOSE PERSONS AND FAMILIES AND BY PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH BENEFITS OF YOGA AND COMPLIMENTARY THERAPIES AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH; (2) FOR THE PURPOSES OF SUB-CLAUSE (1), “COMPLIMENTARY THERAPIES” SHALL INCLUDE SUCH COMPLEMENTARY THERAPY FALLING WITHIN GROUPS 1 AND 2 OF THE THERAPIES ORIGINALLY DEFINED BY THE HOUSE OF LORDS SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY COMMITTEE REPORT ON COMPLEMENTARY AND ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE (SEE ANNEX A) OR ANY SUCH OTHER COMPLEMENTARY THERAPY WHICH THE CHARITY COMMISSION ACCEPTS AS BEING CHARITABLE, AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM APPROPRIATE AND ARE CARRIED OUT IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHARITY LAW.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window