Financial history FISHER HOUSE UK

Charity number: 1164427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024 31/03/2025
Total gross income £3.63k £15.53k £10.68k £6.02k £2.73k
Total expenditure £3.08k £16.05k £11.20k £5.90k £2.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A