THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, DARLINGTON

Charity number: 1162481
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting in the parish the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £98,526
Total expenditure: £75,540

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Darlington

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 July 2015: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • HOLY TRINITY PCC DARLINGTON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CAROLINE JANE STEWART BSC, FCCA Chair 17 April 2016
None on record
Dr Stanley James David Renwick Trustee 21 May 2023
HOLY TRINITY YOUTH CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE
Received: On time
Jonathan Louis King Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Rev Thomas James Harvey Trustee 21 April 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CUTHBERT'S CHURCH
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST CUTHBERT'S CHURCH, DARLINGTON
Received: On time
Pauline Virginia Huntley Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Kathleen Wood Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Mary Grimes Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
Eleanor Jane Willoughby Blackburn Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
Robert Eden Trustee 01 May 2017
The Greatham Foundation Ltd
Received: 9 days late
Prudence Farrier Trustee 09 April 2017
HOLY TRINITY YOUTH CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE
Received: On time
Tracy Dunn Trustee 09 April 2017
None on record
Christopher Hawkes Trustee 13 July 2015
None on record
Helen Ann Morgan Trustee 13 July 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £53.55k £72.32k £72.32k £75.81k £98.53k
Total expenditure £75.07k £67.65k £67.65k £66.68k £75.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 24 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
109 CLEVELAND AVENUE
DARLINGTON
DL3 7BD
Phone:
07919414729