Financial history LONGLEIGH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1169016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £2.53m £3.98m £2.41m £1.21m £1.25m
Total expenditure £1.44m £1.83m £1.46m £1.57m £1.19m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.50m £3.80m £2.16m £907.90k £920.04k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £31.40k £179.76k £255.42k £297.92k £328.75k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.42m £1.81m £1.39m £1.51m £1.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £21.03k £19.77k £68.10k £65.63k £44.60k
Expenditure - Governance £53.45k £53.10k £55.68k £54.99k £47.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £845.92k £929.25k £442.02k £225.00k £230.66k
Expenditure - Investment management £21.03k £11.42k £11.83k £11.94k £13.26k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0