Financial history SWANSEA EASTSIDE FOODBANK

Charity number: 1163300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.47k £21.05k £11.14k £15.82k £10.55k
Total expenditure £5.33k £4.83k £5.34k £7.24k £12.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £1.24k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.50k N/A £1.24k N/A £1.89k