Trustees SWANSEA EASTSIDE FOODBANK
Charity number: 1163300

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Revd Christopher George Illtyd Lewis | Chair | 15 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Michaela barratt | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Davies | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Edwards | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ashley mansell | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Rogers | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachana Patel | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey John Roberts | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kath Parry | Trustee | 10 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA AMANDA EVANS | Trustee | 25 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL LLOYD | Trustee | 15 August 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.