Financial history BONEI OLAM LIMITED

Charity Number: 1163637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £760.31k £1.50m £1.29m £1.35m £1.68m
Total expenditure £759.53k £1.16m £1.57m £1.35m £1.59m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £697.11k £1.41m £1.17m £1.25m £1.42m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £11.58k £12.98k £21.36k £104.72k
Income - Charitable activities £53.92k £63.57k £100.40k £78.61k £150.18k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £9.28k £20.09k £8.73k £4.55k £4.33k
Income - Legacies £0 £30.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £691.23k £854.28k £1.24m £1.05m £1.06m
Expenditure - Raising funds £68.30k £198.42k £213.07k £114.64k £289.91k
Expenditure - Governance £10.76k £17.82k £20.00k £8.39k £8.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £108.99k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £105.08k £118.09k £186.90k £239.17k