Financial history WIGAN JUNIOR LATICS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1164077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 19/06/2020 19/06/2021 19/06/2022 19/06/2023 19/06/2024
Total gross income £51.63k £58.82k £70.93k £64.00k £60.65k
Total expenditure £73.94k £65.83k £66.30k £59.00k £76.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A