YEADING MASJID & AL MADINA ISLAMIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Islamic support activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ealing
- Harrow
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 28 September 2015: Standard registration
- YEADING MASJID (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIR MAHBUBUL ALAM | Chair | 03 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abu Ahmed Jainal Abedin | Trustee | 08 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shah Noor Ahmed | Trustee | 08 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed A Shahid | Trustee | 08 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tareq Ahmed | Trustee | 03 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
GULAM KIBRIA BELAL AHMED | Trustee | 03 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sayful Islam | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Sunu Choudhury | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
FARUK AHMED | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
TARIF MIAH | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|||||
MAHBOOB HANIF RAHMAN ISLAM | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.08k | £480 | £948 | £352 | £758 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.08k | £360 | £223 | £180 | £1.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 March 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 February 2021 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 MAY 2014 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/2014
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM ACCORDING TO THE QURAN, THE SUNNAH AND HADITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yeading Masjid C/o Taj Mahal
4 Willow Tree Lane
HAYES
Middlesex
UB4 9BB
- Phone:
- 07985786786
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window