UNION OF UEA STUDENTS LIMITED

Charity Number: 1162866
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advances the education of UEA students. Promotes interests and welfare of UEA students. Provides advice and support services for UEA students. Provides representative channel for UEA students between the University and external bodies. Provides social, cultural, sporting and recreational activities, discussion forums, catering, entertainment and retail services for members.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 July 2015: Standard registration
  • 25 August 2015: Funds received from 1139778 THE UNION OF UEA STUDENTS
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • UEASU (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nora Loga Trustee 01 February 2025
None on record
YINBO YU Trustee 01 December 2024
None on record
Peter Mason Trustee 01 December 2024
None on record
Ali Shaker Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Bhaskar Bukkanahalli Shivanna Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Chris Kershaw Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Olivia Hunt Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Rebekah Temple-Fielder Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Katerina Illiopoulou Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Peter Robertson Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Nathan Wyatt Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Anwar Azari Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Simon George Trustee 01 December 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £11.39m £9.26m £6.18m £8.16m £7.10m
Total expenditure £11.85m £10.36m £6.51m £7.91m £7.52m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.34m £34.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.30m £1.38m £1.92m £1.92m £1.91m
Income - Other trading activities £9.38m £6.50m £2.26m £5.45m £4.39m
Income - Charitable activities £672.00k £647.00k £217.00k £717.00k £737.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £39.00k £733.00k £1.79m £73.00k £71.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.68m £1.67m £1.37m £1.44m £1.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds £9.18m £0 £0 £0 £4.76m
Expenditure - Governance £15.00k £12.00k £10.00k £24.00k £32.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £8.69m £5.14m £6.47m £1.10m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Own use assets £6.35m £5.61m £5.14m £4.68m £4.27m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.75m £1.06m £1.88m £2.41m £2.26m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£2.47m -£3.46m -£3.21m -£2.60m -£2.66m
Total liabilities £1.44m £1.30m £2.20m £2.23m £2.31m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 19 June 2024 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 19 June 2024 19 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 12 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 12 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 14 June 2022 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 June 2022 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 21 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 21 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 July 2020 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 July 2020 60 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
UNION HOUSE
University of East Anglia
Norwich Research Park
Earlham Road
NORWICH
NR4 7TJ
Phone:
01603592181