Financial history HELLENSMUSIC

Charity Number: 1167396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £107.55k £18.13k £32.30k £104.82k £31.30k
Total expenditure £51.79k £34.58k £59.50k £65.81k £64.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A